Panjwani, Gulshan Dilip (CPSO#: 75347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Saurashtra University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sleep & Alertness Clinic
Suite 800
790 Bay street
Toronto ON  M5G1N8
Phone: 647 479 2156
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Parry Sound Health Centre
10 James Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 1Z3
Canada
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Panjwani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Panjwani ( CPSO# 75347 )

Business Address:
Sleep & Alertness Clinic
Suite 800
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (647) 479-2156

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GULSHAN DILIP PANJWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANJWANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2001 to 31 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004