Pantarotto, Jason Rene (CPSO#: 77562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70196
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Pantarotto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pantarotto ( CPSO# 77562 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiation Oncology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON RENE PANTAROTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANTAROTTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008