Papadopoulos, Yousef Gregory (CPSO#: 85709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universita Palackeho, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2106
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yousef Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Papadopoulos ( CPSO# 85709 )

Business Address:
Comprehensive Psychiatric Care Unit
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOUSEF GREGORY PAPADOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPADOPOULOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 28 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012