Papia, Giuseppe (CPSO#: 73955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 83680
Fax: (416) 480-5815
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Papia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Papia ( CPSO# 73955 )

Business Address:
Room H185
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE PAPIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005