Paquette, Stephanie (CPSO#: 90990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone: 6136321111 Ext. 52001
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Paquette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Paquette ( CPSO# 90990 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE PAQUETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAQUETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 10 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2012 to 10 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2015