Paradiso, Monica Celina (CPSO#: 94871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  25 Oct 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
120 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1E2
Phone: 647-343-4115
Fax: 647-346-5015
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Monica Celina Paradiso may practise Psychiatry at the Women's Mental
                  Health  Clinic, located at 120 Eglinton Avenue East, in Toronto, Ontario,
                  while under  supervision  coordinated  by  a supervisor acceptable to the
                  College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  three  years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Paradiso's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports  to  the  College  by  the  due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Paradiso's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on October 26, 2016, and will expire  on  or
                  before October 25, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.