Parajian, Armen (CPSO#: 92997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: Paraghamian, Armen (used until: 19 Nov 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 6021
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
9N-959
Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M5G-2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340-5354
Fax: 416 340-4556
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Armen Parajian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parajian ( CPSO# 92997 )

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
2nd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMEN PARAJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARAJIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2017