Pararajasingam, Thevaki (CPSO#: 93034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Valpar Medical Clinic
9275 Markham Road Unit 1A-1
Markham, Ontario
L6E 1A2
Markham ON  L6E 1A2
Phone: (905) 554-4500
Fax: 905-554-4700
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pararajasingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pararajasingam ( CPSO# 93034 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A-1
9275 Markham Road
Markham ON  L6E 1A2
Phone Number: (905) 554-4500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Thevaki  Pararajasingam  may  practise  medicine  independently  in family
            medicine, only.