Parbhakar, Samir Rajan (CPSO#: 79624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
217 Terrace Hill St.
Unit 106
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 304-8400
Fax: 519-304-8402
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. R. Parbhakar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Parbhakar ( CPSO# 79624 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 106
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 304-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 15 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR RAJAN PARBHAKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARBHAKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013