Pardhan, Alim (CPSO#: 80839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alim Pardhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pardhan ( CPSO# 93447 )
Dr. A. Pardhan ( CPSO# 80839 )

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5

Business Address:
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIM PARDHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009