Parent, Maria Margaret (CPSO#: 77479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: Boldt, Maria Margaret (used until: 13 Aug 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA MARGARET PARENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2005