Park, Ingrid (CPSO#: 93689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ingrid Park may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.