Park, Jong Bum (CPSO#: 73443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
P.O. Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Park Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Park ( CPSO# 73443 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONG BUM PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2001