Park, Yunjin Sarah (CPSO#: 96022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 Gerry Fitzgerald Drive
North York ON  M3J3N4
Phone: 416-739-1562
Fax: 416-739-6671
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1880 EGLINTON AVE E #152
Scarborough ON  M1L 2L1
Canada
Phone: (416) 285-7575
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York University
4700 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1P3
Canada
Phone: 647-722-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUNJIN SARAH PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013