Parkash, Sandhya (CPSO#: 83565)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Satyanarayana, Sandhya (used until: 14 Aug 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 28 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008