Parker, Anne Maniesha (CPSO#: 95115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: De Silva, Anne Maniesha (used until: 12 Apr 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St.
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5645
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox & Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Canada
Phone: 705-653-1140
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parker ( CPSO# 95115 )
Dr. J. Parker ( CPSO# 95449 )

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
99 University Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MANIESHA PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2013