Parker, Elaine (CPSO#: 79451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 1143
2958 Greenfield Road
Ayr ON  N0B 1E0
Phone: (519) 632-1229
Fax: (519) 632-1253
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13 Water St. N
Waterloo Region Nurse Practitioner
Led Clinic
Cambridge ON  N1R 3B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 772-2322
Fax: (519) 772-2323
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Fairview Mennonite Home
Longterm Care
515 Langs Dr
Cambridge ON  N3H 5E4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

unit 301
35 Metcalf st
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Canada
Phone: 519 539-1111
Fax: 519 539-9111
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

1145 concession Rd.
Cambridge ON  N3H 4L5
Canada
Phone: (519) 653-1470
Fax: (519) 653-1257
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Parker ( CPSO# 79451 )

Business Address:
Waterloo Region
Nurse Practitioner-Led Clinic
13 Water Street North
Cambridge ON  N1R 3B2
Phone Number: (226) 887-0217

Business Address:
Fairview Mennonite Home
Long-Term Care
525 Langs Drive
Cambridge ON  N3H 5E4
Phone Number: (519) 653-5719

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Business Address:
301 - 35 Metcalf Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 3E6
Phone Number: (519) 539-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Feb 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2006