Parker, Jeffrey William (CPSO#: 95449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anesthesiology, Victory 2
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2482
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox & Addington County General
Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr.
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parker ( CPSO# 95449 )
Dr. A. Parker ( CPSO# 95115 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
99 University Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6000

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2B5
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 23 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2013