Parker, Melissa Joy (CPSO#: 77630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Pediatric Critical Care
Faculty of Health Sciences
McMaster University
1280 Main St. W., HSC 3E-20
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76651
Fax: (905) 570-8973
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Emergency Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76651
Fax: (905) 570-8973
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa J. Parker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parker ( CPSO# 77630 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Pediatrics Critical Care
3E-20 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA JOY PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006