Parker, Torrey May (CPSO#: 94083)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 3493
Fax: 613-738-4845
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TORREY MAY PARKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015