Parmar, Ambika (CPSO#: 101221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of SE Ontario
25 King Street W
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBIKA PARMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2018