Parmar, Avneet (CPSO#: 96982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Leicester, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Family Health Clinic
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone: (705) 435-8887
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Avneet Parmar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Parmar ( CPSO# 96982 )

Business Address:
Windsor Family Health Clinic
36 Victoria Street West
Alliston ON  L9R 1S8
Phone Number: (705) 435-8887

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVNEET PARMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013