Parmar, Varinderjit Singh (CPSO#: 91427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanderjit Parmar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parmar ( CPSO# 91427 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville Division
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARINDERJIT SINGH PARMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014