Parnandi, Vandana Nikhila (CPSO#: 88837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Ottawa ON  K4A 5E6
Phone: (613) 841-7009 Ext. 218
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

370 Kennedy Lane E
Orleans ON  K1E 3X5
Canada
Phone: (613) 830-2633
Fax: (613) 830-9910
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vandana Parnandi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Parnandi ( CPSO# 88837 )

Business Address:
370 Kennedy Lane East
Orleans ON  K1E 3X5
Phone Number: (613) 830-2633

Business Address:
Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Phone Number: (613) 841-7009

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANDANA NIKHILA PARNANDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARNANDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010