Parr, Jennifer Lemont (CPSO#: 74694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Robertson, Jennifer Lemont (used until: 14 Sep 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road
R R 5
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Fax: (519) 264-2742
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Parr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parr ( CPSO# 74694 )

Business Address:
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road
R.R. #5
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Business Address:
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEMONT PARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002