Parry, Dominic James (CPSO#: 97147)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leicester, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Parry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 19 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018