Parshuram, Christopher Sushil (CPSO#: 74049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4919
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Parshuram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Parshuram ( CPSO# 74049 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Critical Care Medicine Program
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-4919

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Christopher Sushil Parshuram may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Parshuram  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  will  automatically expire when Dr. Parshuram no longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.