Parthasarathy, Sujatha (CPSO#: 92159)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Kerala, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 15 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Sep 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2010