Parveen, Sayema (CPSO#: 113949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 29 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dhaka, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Department of Family and
Community Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8200
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bangladesh

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAYEMA PARVEEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PARVEEN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. PARVEEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PARVEEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PARVEEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PARVEEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PARVEEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2017 to 28 Jan 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 25 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019