Parvez, Boriana (CPSO#: 74224)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 18 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2013