Parvez, Elena (CPSO#: 95945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E.
Department of General Surgery
6 North, Rm 604, Mailbox 322
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44665
Fax: (905) 524-2424
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA PARVEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARVEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2016