Pascali, Dante Umberto (CPSO#: 74513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 761-9292
Fax: (613) 722-1310
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dante Pascali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pascali ( CPSO# 74513 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 5X2
Phone Number: (613) 761-9292

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANTE UMBERTO PASCALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASCALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2000 to 12 Mar 2000
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003