Pasion, Stella Rodriguez (CPSO#: 71223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone: (519) 827-1399
Fax: (519) 827-1858
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Richard Helyar and Stella R. Pasion Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Helyar ( CPSO# 70202 )
Dr. S. Pasion ( CPSO# 71223 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
77 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5J1
Phone Number: (519) 827-1399

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STELLA RODRIGUEZ PASION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2000