Paskar, David Drew Adamson (CPSO#: 93427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 3-074, Donnelly Wing
St. MIchael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5284
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario
Room B5-12
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Oakville Trafalger Memorial Hosp.
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DREW ADAMSON PASKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015