Passerin, Orlando (CPSO#: 92182)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011