Passos, Edward Martins (CPSO#: 94609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: 9055779966
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Passos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Passos ( CPSO# 94609 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite 6N
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD MARTINS PASSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 15 Feb 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015