Pastia, Cristina Ioana (CPSO#: 86244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: Stanculescu, Cristina Ioana (used until: 22 Nov 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cristina I. Pastia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pastia ( CPSO# 86244 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6435

Business Address:
Carlton & Church Medical
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA IOANA PASTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2010