Pastre, Robert Joseph (CPSO#: 91087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2015 Bancroft Drive ,Sudbury, On
Sudbury ON  P3B 1T1
Phone: 705-222-6337
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pastre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pastre ( CPSO# 91087 )

Business Address:
2015 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1T1
Phone Number: (705) 222-6337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH PASTRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011