Patafio, Francis Michael (CPSO#: 97730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212 Ext. 2153
Fax: 905-883-2156
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.M. Patafio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Patafio ( CPSO# 97730 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS MICHAEL PATAFIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATAFIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016