Patasi, Beata (CPSO#: 92183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Hungarian, Russian, Slovak

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B.Patasi Medicine Professional Corp
RR #1 Bacchus Island
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5B8
Phone: 1(613) -592-14
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Med-Team Clinic
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Canada
Phone: (613) 592-1448
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Findlay Creek Medical Centre
4744 Bank Street Unit 3
Ottawa ON  K1T 3W7
Canada
Phone: 613-317-2584
Fax: 613-822-2775
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Patasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Patasi ( CPSO# 92183 )

Business Address:
Med-Team Clinic - Walk-In Medical Clinic
99 Kakulu Road
Suite 103
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1448

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEATA PATASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Feb 2010 to 11 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2012