Patchett-Marble, Ryan James (CPSO#: 95618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: 807-229-2672
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Patchett-Marble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Patchett-Marble ( CPSO# 95618 )

Business Address:
Marathon Family Health Team
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-1740

Business Address:
26 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN JAMES PATCHETT-MARBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATCHETT-MARBLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013