Patel, Akash Mahesh (CPSO#: 93097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway West, Suit 137
Mississauga ON  L5B2P7
Phone: (647) 875-8221
Fax: 905-593-5335
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West GTA Endoscopy
2225 Erin Mills Pkwy #183
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akash M. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 93097 )

Business Address:
Suite 137
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5O 2P7
Phone Number: (647) 875-8221

Business Address:
Suite 183
2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKASH MAHESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2015 to 03 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014