Patel, Alkesh (CPSO#: 89180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University College, Cork, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

508 - 2000 Credit Valley Rd
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-2837 Ext. 22
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alkesh Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 89180 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
508-2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2837

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALKESH PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2015