Patel, Amit (CPSO#: 93859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: (226) 674-4881
Fax: (519)-250-5088
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TBRHSC
980 Oliver road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Canada
Phone: 807-684-6100
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W1L9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Dialysis Unit
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4444 Ext. 32634
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519 973 4444
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 93859 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dialysis Unit
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Suite 405
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 684-9288

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6158

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIT PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014