Patel, Anish Kantilal (CPSO#: 90527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
801 Eglinton Ave West
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Fax: (416) 789-2253
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anish Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 90527 )

Business Address:
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Business Address:
A13 - 9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T1
Phone Number: (905) 893-8085

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANISH KANTILAL PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011