Patel, Apurva (CPSO#: 91590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

L&A County General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

QHC North Hastings Hospital
1H Manor Lane
P.O. Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

QHC Prince Edward County Mem. Hosp.
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-1008
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
Phone: (613) 392-2540
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apurva Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 91590 )

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 696-7400

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington County General Hospital
3 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
QHC Prince Edward County Hospital
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1008

Business Address:
QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-2540

Business Address:
QHC North Hastings Hospital
1H Manor Lane
PO Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0K 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. APURVA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014