Patel, Ashish Devendra (CPSO#: 97542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Cardiology
East Wing 5-466
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5815
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHISH DEVENDRA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016