Patel, Falguni (CPSO#: 82970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rexdale Medical Clinic
Units 10 & 11
680 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B5
Phone: (416) 213-9577
Fax: (416) 213-9588
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Patel ( CPSO# 82970 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
Units 10 & 11
680 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B5
Phone Number: (416) 213-9577

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FALGUNI PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008