Patel, Hareshkumar Vitthalbhai (CPSO#: 85407)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gujarat University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2006 to 14 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2006 to 14 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2009