Patel, Milan V (CPSO#: 72303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6079
Fax: (905) 858-8835
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Health Centre
Trillium Health Partners
2nd Floor - Medical Clinics
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4100
Fax: (416) 521-4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan V. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel ( CPSO# 72303 )

Business Address:
214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAN V PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002